WV HCR32 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-29 - House received Senate message
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-29 - House received Senate message
Summary
The "William Bradley Fulks Memorial Bridge"
Title
The "William Bradley Fulks Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
Del. Kevin Craig [D] | Del. Carol Miller [R] | Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Del. Douglas Reynolds [D] |
Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Dale Stephens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-29 | House received Senate message | |
2008-02-29 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-02-29 | Communicated to House | |
2008-02-29 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-29 | On Unfinished Business | |
2008-02-28 | Reported be adopted | |
2008-02-12 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-12 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-12 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-11 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-11 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2008-02-11 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Be adopted | |
2008-02-05 | To House Rules | |
2008-02-05 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-05 | To Rules | |
2008-02-05 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2008&sessiontype=RS&input4=32&billtype=CR&houseorig=H&btype=res |