WV HR7 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging federal policymakers to supports legislation advancing the development of an Appalachian Storage Hub
Title
Urging federal policymakers to support legislation advancing the development of an Appalachian Storage Hub
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-02-28 | House | Adopted, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2018-02-28 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Be adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | To House Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | To House Energy |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-07 | House | To Energy then Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |