WV SB14 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating WV Farm-to-School Grant Program
Title
Creating WV Farm-to-School Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-12 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 103) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2019-01-25 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 36 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 36 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 36 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 36 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 37 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 37 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 37 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 37 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |