WV SB142 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a tax incentive for the creation, construction or enlargement of tourism attractions or amenities. The credit operates to allow the taxpayer to recover up to twenty-five percent or, in the case of bed and breakfast facilities, fifty percent, of qualified eighty percent investment in a tourism attraction or amenity by offsetting up to eighty percent of consumers sales and service tax collected by the taxpayer from customers over a period of either five or ten years at the election of the taxpayer.
Title
Relating to Tourism Development Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Randy White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | To House Finance | |
2009-04-02 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2009-03-31 | To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business | |
2009-03-31 | To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-31 | Ordered to House | |
2009-03-31 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2009-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-30 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-27 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-27 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-26 | Reported do pass | |
2009-03-17 | To Finance | |
2009-03-17 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2009-02-11 | To Economic Development | |
2009-02-11 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-02-11 | To Economic Development then Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13Z | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13Z | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=142&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |