WV SB156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Fire Commission rule relating to standards for certification and continuing education of municipal, county, and other public sector building code officials, building code inspectors, and plans examiners
Title
Authorizing Department of Homeland Security to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 168) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 168) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 233) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 232) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 168) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 233) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 232) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 172, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/21 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-25 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/21 |
2021-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-24 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 168) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 168) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 233) |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 232) |
2021-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-02-17 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-02-17 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2442 (Similar To) 2021-02-13 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |