WV SB16 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Energy
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - To House Energy
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing section related to wind power projects
Title
Repealing section related to wind power projects
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 139) (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | To House Energy |
2017-03-20 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 139) |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 6A | 5a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |