WV SB18 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-25 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-25 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring ACT and ACT Aspire to be used as comprehensive statewide student assessment
Title
Requiring new comprehensive statewide student assessment
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 191) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 190) (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Floor amendments adopted (Roll No. 186) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 185) (Y: 9 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Motion to refer to Finance rejected (Roll No. 183) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 190) (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Floor amendments adopted (Roll No. 186) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 185) (Y: 9 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Motion to refer to Finance rejected (Roll No. 183) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-25 | House | To House Education |
2017-03-27 | House | To Education then Finance |
2017-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 191) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 190) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senator Jeffries requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senator Beach requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2017-03-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Roll No. 186) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 185) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Motion to refer to Finance rejected (Roll No. 183) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Floor amendments reported |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/22/17 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |