WV SB200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 11, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 11, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 766) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 765) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Motion to concur in Senate amendment (Roll No. 764) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 763) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 519) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 519) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 484) (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 483) (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 313) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 313) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 312) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 765) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Motion to concur in Senate amendment (Roll No. 764) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 763) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 519) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 519) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 484) (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 483) (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 313) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 313) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 312) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 11, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor with deletions 3/14/2024- House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor with deletions 3/14/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor with deletions 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/12/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 766) |
2024-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 765) |
2024-03-09 | House | Motion to concur in Senate amendment (Roll No. 764) |
2024-03-09 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 763) |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 519) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 519) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 484) |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 483) |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/4/2024 |
2024-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Reference dispensed |
2024-02-29 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 313) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 313) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 312) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |