WV SB202 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create and fund the Spay Neuter Assistance Fund. The bill defines the purposes of the fund and requires bookkeeping standards and annual reporting. The bill also increases certain commercial and pet feed registration fees.
Title
Creating WV Spay Neuter Assistance Program and Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Rocky Fitzsimmons [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. David Nohe [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 67) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 303) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 303) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/26/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-26 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 67) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 303) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-03 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-03 | House | To Finance |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2013-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 14 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 20C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 20C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 20C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 20C | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 20C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |