WV SB222 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 265, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 265, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting WV veterans from certain fees and charges at state parks
Title
Exempting WV veterans from certain fees and charges at state parks
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Mike Stuart [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] |
Sen. Amy Nichole Grady [R] | Sen. Laura Wakim Chapman [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 482) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 653) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 653) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 265, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 482) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 653) |
2024-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-30 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 72) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-11 | Senate | To Military |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-11 | Senate | To Military |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |