WV SB238 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the Public Land Corporation to enter into leases and contracts regarding mineral rights on behalf of other state agencies, institutions and departments to benefit their operations.
Title
Relating to mineral rights' benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Del. Frank Deem [R] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Mike Green [D] |
Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Randy White [D] | Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/2/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-04-01 | To Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 73) | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 365) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-05 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-05 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-03-03 | To House Natural Resources | |
2010-03-03 | To Natural Resources then Judiciary | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) | |
2010-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-19 | To Finance | |
2010-02-19 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2010-01-20 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-20 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-20 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4146 (Same As) 2010-01-20 - To House Natural Resources
HB4394 (Similar To) 2010-02-08 - To House Government Organization
HB4394 (Similar To) 2010-02-08 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 11 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=238&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |