WV SB253 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to specify the United States Survey Foot and the associated conversion factor of one meter equals 39.37/12 feet for the purposes of the West Virginia Coordinate System of 1983.
Title
Defining "survey foot"
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-21 | To Governor 3/21/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-06 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-06 | Passed House (Roll No. 341) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-05 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | Do pass | |
2008-02-28 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-27 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 45) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-27 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 44) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-26 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-26 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-26 | Reported do pass | |
2008-01-18 | To Interstate Cooperation | |
2008-01-18 | To Interstate Cooperation | |
2008-01-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-18 | To Interstate Cooperation | |
2008-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=253&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |