WV SB296 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions & Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions & Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing 11-month window to permit members of PERS to purchase credited service
Title
Providing 11-month window to permit members of PERS to purchase credited service
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. William Ihlenfeld [D] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2019-02-14 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 129) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-17 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | To Pensions |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-14 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB122 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - To Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |