WV SB297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending expiration of military members' spouses' driver's license
Title
Extending expiration of military members' spouses' driver's license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-02 | House | To House Finance |
2019-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-02-01 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 1/30/19 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | To Military |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-14 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2784 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |