WV SB308 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Penalizing individuals who violate financial exploitation protective order
Title
Creating criminal penalties for violation of orders issued for protection of victims of financial exploitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 564) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 66) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 66) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 564) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | To House Senior, Children, and Family Issues |
2020-02-06 | House | To Senior, Children, and Family Issues then Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 66) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/3/20 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 7J | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 2 | 29b | Amended Code | Citation Text |