WV SB329 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating sunset provision for commission to study residential placement of children
Title
Eliminating sunset provision for commission to study residential placement of children
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 408) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 408) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-02 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-20 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4105 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 1 | 207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 2 | 125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 709 | Amended Code | Citation Text |