WV SB335 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit certain hospitals to request an exemption from certificates of need for health care facilities in specific instances.
Title
Permitting certain hospitals exemption from certificate of need
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 377) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 94) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 94) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 94) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 94) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 377) |
2013-04-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 376) |
2013-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | House | Sub. amend. for committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-13 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2013-04-13 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2013-04-13 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2013-04-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2013-04-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2013-03-06 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2013-03-06 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2536 (Same As) 2013-02-19 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2D | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |