WV SB336 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing certain DMV applicants ability to contribute to WV Department of Veterans Assistance
Title
Providing certain DMV applicants ability to contribute to WV Department of Veterans Assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] |
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 496) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 496) |
2018-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-08 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-09 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-09 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2018-02-05 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-22 | Senate | To Military |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-22 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |