WV SB339 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to correct an invalid code section reference.
Title
Correcting invalid code reference related to voter registration list
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Approved by Governor 3/18/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/18/10 | |
2010-03-19 | Approved by Governor 3/18/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/10 | |
2010-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-10 | House Message received | |
2010-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 227) | |
2010-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-09 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-09 | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 9) | |
2010-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Passed House (Roll No. 197) | |
2010-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-08 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-05 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-04 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-03 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-02-03 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-03 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-02 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) | |
2010-02-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-01-29 | Read 1st time | |
2010-01-29 | On 1st reading | |
2010-01-28 | Reported do pass | |
2010-01-22 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-22 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-22 | To Judiciary | |
2010-01-22 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4169 (Same As) 2010-01-25 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=339&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |