WV SB341 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - To House Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - To House Agriculture
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring livestock be enclosed by fence
Title
Relating to livestock fencing and trespassing
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. David Nohe [R] |
Sen. Daniel Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | To House Agriculture |
2013-03-25 | House | To Agriculture then Judiciary |
2013-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2013-03-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 17 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 17 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
19 | 18 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |