WV SB378 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add garbage trucks and other sanitation vehicles to the definition of authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
Relating to special speed limitations as to waste service vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 270) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 269) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 269) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 270) |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-05 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 269) |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2014-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-17 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-17 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 15 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17C | 6 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |