WV SB402 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to codify the USCCA to provide concealed carry classes in West Virginia.
Title
Authorizing US Concealed Carry Association to provide concealed carry classes in WV
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 79) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 79) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4918 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |