WV SB427 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the requirements for certain motor vehicle searches.
Title
Clarifying requirements for certain motor vehicle searches
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Green [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |