WV SB461 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extending time to file petition for motor fuel excise tax refund
Title
Extending time to file petition for motor fuel excise tax refund
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 393) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 370) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 128) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 370) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 128) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 393) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 370) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-16 | House | To Finance |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 128) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 14C | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 14C | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |