WV SB499 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 244, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 244, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending WV tax laws to conform to changes in partnerships for federal income tax purposes
Title
Amending WV tax laws to conform to changes in partnerships for federal income tax purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 528) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 528) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 602) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 601) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 109) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 109) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 528) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 602) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 601) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 109) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 109) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 244, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 528) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 528) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 602) |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 601) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 109) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 109) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2798 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 10 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 10 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 10 | 18c | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | 37a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 37b | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 37c | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 51a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | 59a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 71a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 24 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |