WV SB499 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing legislative rules for School Building Authority
Title
Authorizing legislative rules for School Building Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 361) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 360) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 360) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 97, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-03 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 361) |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 360) |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-09 | House | To House Education |
2022-02-09 | House | To Education |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 83) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 83) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-01-28 | Senate | To Education |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-28 | Senate | To Education |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9D | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |