WV SB544 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is relating to extend the expiration date of exemptions for occupied vehicles with sleeper-berth compartments from May 1, 2012 to May 1, 2017, in the Diesel-Powered Motor Vehicle Idling Act which regulates the idling time of a diesel-powered motor vehicle, subject to certain exceptions.
Title
Removing expiration date for certain diesel-powered motor vehicle idling restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 26) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 375) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 375) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 127, Acts, Regular Session, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 26) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 375) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-03-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-02-24 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2012-02-24 | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-23 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-23 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-23 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-20 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-08 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-08 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 13A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |