WV SB563 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting sexual assault victim be subjected to certain physical examinations
Title
Prohibiting sexual assault victim be subjected to certain physical examinations
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 143) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 143) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 143) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 143) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 143) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8B | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |