WV SB564 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing minimum construction cost of municipal public works project before competitive bidding is required
Title
Increasing minimum construction cost of municipal public works project before competitive bidding is required
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 396) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 107) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 107) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/30/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/26/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-26 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 107) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 396) |
2013-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2013-04-02 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |