WV SB564 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify the West Virginia Independent Living Act and provisions relating to the statewide Independent Living Council to conform to requirements of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973, as amended.
Title
Relating to Statewide Independent Living Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 361) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 362) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 160) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 362) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 160) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 361) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 362) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-22 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-22 | House | To Government Organization |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 160) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 10M | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 10M | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 10M | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 10M | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 10M | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |