WV SB601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to personal income tax
Title
Relating to personal income tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 263) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | To Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 263) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |