WV SB634 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adding, increasing, and decreasing appropriations from General Revenue to DHHR
Title
Adding, increasing, and decreasing appropriations from General Revenue to DHHR
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Karen Arvon [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Sen. Mark Drennan [R] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] |
Sen. Kenny Mann [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 531) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 530) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 529) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 401) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 401) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 530) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 529) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 401) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 401) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/14/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 531) |
2018-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 530) |
2018-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-10 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 529) |
2018-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-10 | House | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-10 | House | Do pass |
2018-03-09 | House | To House Finance |
2018-03-09 | House | To Finance |
2018-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 401) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 401) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |