WV SB644 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make procedures for election contests before a special court applicable to contested elections of certain judges; changing jurisdiction of election contests for county, district, and municipal elections to the circuit courts; requiring a recount proceeding to be completed before filing certain election contests.
Title
Updating contested elections procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 254) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 254) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2836 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 7 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |