WV SB702 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating specific grade levels in which nutrition and physical fitness programs are taught
Title
Designating specific grade levels in which nutrition and physical fitness programs are taught
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 157) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | To House Education |
2020-02-18 | House | To Education |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 157) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 157) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2 | 7e | New Code | See Bill Text |