WV SB722 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to special license plates for public and private nonprofit transit providers
Title
Relating to special license plates for public and private nonprofit transit providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 213) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 213) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 212) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 213) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 212) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment pending |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | House | From Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-21 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-21 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 213) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 213) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 212) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4730 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 3c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |