WV SB732 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require cooperation between law-enforcement agencies and military authorities; providing that prosecuting attorneys may assign an assistant prosecutor to provide assistance to the National Guard or other military authority within the state; providing that law-enforcement shall share certain information with military authorities regarding military members; and establishing purpose of the amendments.
Title
Requiring cooperation between law-enforcement agencies and military authorities
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 472) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 589) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 589) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 472) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 589) |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-06 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-29 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/16/2024 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |