WV SB851 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish requirements for contingency fee arrangements between political subdivisions and private attorneys.
Title
Establishing requirements for contingency fee agreements between political subdivisions and private attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 269) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 269) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/24/2024 |
2024-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 28 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 28 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 40 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |