WV SB94 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating State Police Superintendent as administrator and enforcer of motor vehicle inspection program
Title
Designating State Police Superintendent as administrator and enforcer of motor vehicle inspection program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 403) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 191) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 191) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/16 |
2016-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/14/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 403) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2016-03-04 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2016-02-25 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2016-02-25 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Government Organization |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 191) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 16 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |