WV SCR20 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-14 - House Message received
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-14 - House Message received
Summary
Urging Congress pass legislation protecting public from toxic and hazardous imports
Title
Urging Congress pass legislation protecting public from toxic and hazardous imports
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Hunter [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Shirley Love [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-14 | House Message received | |
2008-02-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-02-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-13 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-13 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2008-02-13 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Be adopted | |
2008-02-11 | To House Rules | |
2008-02-11 | To Rules | |
2008-02-11 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-08 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-08 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2007-02-08 | On Unfinished Business | |
2008-02-07 | Committee substitute reported | |
2008-01-17 | To Judiciary | |
2008-01-17 | To Judiciary | |
2008-01-17 | On Unfinished Business | |
2008-01-16 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-16 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2008&sessiontype=RS&input4=20&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |