WV SCR27 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging President and Congress establish provisions to prevent and respond to chemical spills in state and national waters
Title
Urging President and Congress establish provisions to prevent and respond to chemical spills in state and national waters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Adopted by House, Daily Calendar (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-03-06 | House | On Unfinished Business, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Be adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | To House Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | To Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2014-02-06 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-06 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |