WV SCR49 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Completed legislative action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Completed legislative action
Summary
Requesting DOH name bridge in Mercer County "Isabella Freeman Memorial Bridge"
Title
Requesting DOH name bridge in Mercer County "Isabella Freeman Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Adopted by House (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-13 | Be adopted | |
2010-03-10 | To House Rules | |
2010-03-10 | To Rules | |
2010-03-10 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-10 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-10 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-10 | On Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-09 | Reported be adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-03-08 | On Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-05 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-03-05 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2010&sessiontype=RS&input4=49&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |