WV SCR5 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name bridge number 20-19-0.01 in Kanawha County "Army PFC William Floyd Harrison Memorial Bridge"
Title
Requesting DOH name bridge in Kanawha County "Army PFC William Floyd Harrison Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
Sen. Erik Wells [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Chris Walters [R] |
Sen. Jack Yost [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-24 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Adopted by House, Daily Calendar (Voice vote) |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-02-24 | House | On Unfinished Business, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | Be adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | To House Rules |
2014-01-23 | House | To Rules |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-01-13 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |