WV SCR5 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Coach Bill Stewart Exit
Title
Coach Bill Stewart Exit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-23 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-23 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2016-02-23 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Be adopted |
2016-02-05 | House | To House Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | To Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-01-20 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-01-20 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |