WV SCR9 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-29 - House Message received
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-29 - House Message received
Summary
Expressing will of Legislature opposing adoption of national cap and trade program
Title
Expressing will of Legislature opposing adoption of national cap and trade program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | House Message received | |
2010-01-28 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-01-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-01-28 | Adopted by House (Roll No. 10) | |
2010-01-28 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-01-28 | Reference dispensed | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in House | |
2010-01-27 | Ordered to House | |
2010-01-27 | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2010-01-27 | Committee reference dispensed | |
2010-01-27 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-01-27 | On Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2010&sessiontype=RS&input4=9&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |