WV SR53 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Glenville State College for its efforts in making education more affordable
Title
Recognizing Glenville State College for its efforts in making education more affordable
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on Unfinished Business 2/28/18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on Unfinished Business 2/27/18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |