WY HB0006 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trust companies; establishing procedures for mergers and acquisitions of supervised trust companies; authorizing supervised trust company branching related to mergers and acquisitions; amending the composition of the state banking board to include public trust company members; amending the definition of "trust company"; amending other trust company definitions; authorizing bankruptcy filing requirements; amending applicability of organization requirements; amending meeting requirements for chartered family trust companies; authorizing rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Trust company amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 3 | |
2021-02-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0002 | |
2021-02-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2021-02-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2021-02-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0002 | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-02-01 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-1-0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-15 | Bill Number Assigned |