WY HB0021 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state public purpose investments; amending and repealing obsolete or unused provisions; providing a sunset date for the University of Wyoming advance payment contract program; amending hydro-power development loan terms; repealing the guarantee program for local government bonds; repealing the area redevelopment program; repealing the lamb processing facility loan program; repealing the student loan standby commitment program; providing a sunset date for the school district bond guarantee program; making conforming amendments; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State public purpose investments-revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0021JC002: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0021JC002: 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Did Not Adopt HB0021JC001: 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0021JC001: 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Did Not Adopt HB0021JC001: 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0021JC001: 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0021JC002: 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Did Not Adopt HB0021JC001: 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0021JC001: 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Did Not Adopt HB0021JC001: 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0021JC001: 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Chapter No. 110 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-11 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0053 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0053 |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0053 |
2016-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0053 | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Adopted HB0021JC002: 29-0-1-0-0 |
2016-03-04 | House | Adopted HB0021JC002: 53-4-3-0-0 |
2016-03-04 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2016-03-04 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Did Not Adopt HB0021JC001: 13-17-0-0-0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Adopted HB0021JC001: 56-3-1-0-0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-03-01 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2016-02-29 | House | Concur:Failed 3-55-2-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-24 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-16 | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 | |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |