WY HB0042 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to government expenditures; restricting the expenditure of fuel tax revenue as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fuel tax revenue-restriction.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 57-3-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |