WY HB0056 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Assigned Chapter Number 75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Assigned Chapter Number 75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; providing for the designation of purple star schools that take specific actions to assist military connected students; specifying requirements for purple star schools; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Purple star schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Assigned Chapter Number 75 | |
2023-02-23 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0050 | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0050 |
2023-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0050 |
2023-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0050 | |
2023-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-16 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-20 | Bill Number Assigned |