WY HB0063 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; repealing the sunset of the exemption on the imposition of state sales and use tax on the repair of rolling stock; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Railroad rolling stock tax exemption.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirkbride [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Rita Campbell [R] |
Rep. Garry Piiparinen [R] | Sen. Paul Barnard [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] |
Sen. John Hines [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - S03 Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed COW |
2014-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-17 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0063.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0063.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0063.htm |